U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-md-01760
  • Case Name: In Re: Aredia and Zometa Products Liability Litigation
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • June 19, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • June 18, 2019: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Enforce Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • May 20, 2016: [Disbursement of Funds]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.