U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-mc-00005
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Crumb et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 11, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 19, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 06, 2016: [Quash]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order of Recusal]
  • June 27, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 27, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 27, 2016: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.