U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mj-00142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Search Warrant
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • April 10, 2020: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2020: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • April 10, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • April 10, 2020: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • December 02, 2019: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • December 02, 2019: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • December 02, 2019: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 29, 2019: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • May 29, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • May 29, 2019: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 01, 2016: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • July 01, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.