U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mj-00164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bailey
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • July 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order]
  • July 19, 2016: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2016: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • July 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • July 13, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 07, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 07, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 07, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.