U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-mj-01093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dogonski et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Order of Detention ]
  • August 11, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • August 08, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 08, 2016: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order of Detention ]
  • August 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2016: [Detention]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order]
  • August 01, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.