U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-mj-01098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burns
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order]
  • February 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order]
  • April 11, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order]
  • March 28, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order]
  • February 26, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Order]
  • April 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order]
  • August 31, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 25, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order]
  • August 01, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 01, 2016: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.