U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-mj-04066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hatcher
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Order of Detention ]
  • August 15, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 12, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • August 11, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 11, 2016: [Leave to File Document under Seal]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order]
  • August 11, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 03, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 03, 2016: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.