U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-mc-00037
  • Case Name: Kloeber v. Joseph et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Writ Returned]
  • October 07, 2016: [Writ Returned]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 26, 2016: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • September 23, 2016: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • September 21, 2016: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • September 20, 2016: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • September 20, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • August 30, 2016: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • August 30, 2016: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • August 29, 2016: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • August 11, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 11, 2016: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.