U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mc-00052
  • Case Name: Universal Tax Systems, Inc. v. Clemmons
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • October 12, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 05, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • October 05, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 04, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 28, 2016: [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
  • September 28, 2016: [Quash]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order]
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 26, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
  • September 26, 2016: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • September 23, 2016: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 23, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 22, 2016: [Order of Recusal]
  • September 22, 2016: [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
  • September 22, 2016: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • September 22, 2016: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.