U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-mc-00003
  • Case Name: In re: Service of Process on United States Attorney per Fed.R.Civ.P.4(i)(1)(A)
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.