U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-mj-00180-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Search Warrant
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • November 10, 2021: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2021: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • November 10, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • November 10, 2021: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • June 24, 2021: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2021: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • June 24, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • June 24, 2021: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 07, 2016: [Unseal Case]
  • October 06, 2016: [Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2016: [Seal Case]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • October 06, 2016: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • October 06, 2016: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.