U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-mc-00046
  • Case Name: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Southeast Food Services Company, LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 23, 2017: [Memorandum & Opinion]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Response to Objection to Magistrate Judge Order]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2017: [Objection to Magistrate Judge Order]
  • April 13, 2017: [Transcript]
  • April 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support (non-motion)]
  • April 10, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • February 28, 2017: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • February 24, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 22, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 18, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • November 18, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.