U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:08-md-01000
  • Case Name: In Re Southeastern Milk Antitrust Litigation
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order]
  • July 30, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2017
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 05, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 25, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.