U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-mj-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Search Warrant
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • June 08, 2017: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2017: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • June 08, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • June 08, 2017: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Unseal Case]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • December 05, 2016: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.