U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-mj-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Search Warrant
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • May 03, 2022: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2022: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • May 03, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • May 03, 2022: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • May 03, 2022: [Seal Case]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Unseal Document]
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 22, 2017: [Unseal Case]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.