U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-mj-00222-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Land et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 03, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 23, 2017: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Letter]
  • December 20, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • December 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • December 19, 2016: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 19, 2016: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing]
  • December 16, 2016: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • December 16, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.