U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mj-02001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Search Warrant
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • January 26, 2022: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • January 26, 2022: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 26, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • January 26, 2022: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2021: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • April 21, 2021: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • April 21, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • April 21, 2021: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 09, 2019: [Unseal Case]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • February 14, 2019: [Unseal Case]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • January 13, 2017: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2017: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • January 13, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • January 13, 2017: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.