U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mj-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Berry
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • May 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 10, 2017: [Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 08, 2017: [Continue]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.