U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-mc-00003
  • Case Name: In re: Loring Justice
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [USCA Order]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [USCA Notice]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Transcript]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Objection]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order]
  • November 21, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • October 07, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • October 04, 2019: [~Util - Document Sealed]
  • October 01, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • August 06, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 16, 2019: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • July 03, 2019: [Sealed Order to Show Cause]
  • July 03, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Letter]
  • February 02, 2017: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.