U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-mj-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hurst
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2017: [Plea and Sentence]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order]
  • March 14, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 27, 2017: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.