U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mc-00010
  • Case Name: Reliant Management Group, LLC v. Brookside Healthcare & Rehab LLC, ET AL.,
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 03, 2018: [Dismiss]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
  • September 27, 2018: [Settlement Agreement]
  • September 27, 2018: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • September 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • September 21, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 21, 2018: [Quash]
  • August 15, 2018: [Objection]
  • August 02, 2018: [Transcript]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Order]
  • July 13, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 12, 2018: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • July 12, 2018: [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 11, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Objection]
  • June 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2018: [Writ Returned]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • April 21, 2017: [Withdraw]
  • April 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2017: [Writ Returned]
  • April 20, 2017: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • April 12, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • April 11, 2017: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.