U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mc-00007
  • Case Name: Arrowsmith v. Discover Diagnostic Laboratory
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
  • May 25, 2017: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • May 23, 2017: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Writ Returned]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • March 09, 2017: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • March 08, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 08, 2017: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.