U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mj-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Search Warrant
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • March 16, 2017: [Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2017: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • March 16, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • March 16, 2017: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.