U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-mj-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Exhibit Withdrawal]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 06, 2017: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 06, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 30, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 30, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2017: [Petition and Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2017: [Bond ]
  • March 24, 2017: [Witness List]
  • March 24, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2017: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 21, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • March 21, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • March 21, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2017: [Arrest ]
  • March 21, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.