U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-mj-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Search Warrant
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • February 08, 2022: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 08, 2022: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • February 08, 2022: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • February 08, 2022: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2021: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • March 18, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • March 18, 2021: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • March 20, 2020: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2020: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • March 20, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • March 20, 2020: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 22, 2017: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.