U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mj-02047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Phelps
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 03, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 03, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Letter]
April, 2017
  • April 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order]
  • April 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 31, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 29, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 24, 2017: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 24, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • March 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • March 24, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 24, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • March 24, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 24, 2017: [Complaint]
  • March 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • March 24, 2017: [Seal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.