U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-mj-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mann
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Order]
  • June 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 06, 2017: [Status Conference]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 30, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2017: [Docket Call]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 06, 2017: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order]
  • March 28, 2017: [Bond ]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 28, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • March 28, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • March 28, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2017: [Arrest ]
  • March 28, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.