U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mc-00012
  • Case Name: Brown v. Pixelrange, Inc
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 05, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 07, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 23, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • April 05, 2018: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • April 05, 2018: [Writ Returned]
  • April 04, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 28, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • March 27, 2018: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 20, 2018: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • March 19, 2018: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2018: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2018: [Set Aside Judgment]
  • March 12, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 09, 2018: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • March 07, 2018: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • March 06, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed (non-USA)]
  • March 05, 2018: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • February 28, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • February 27, 2018: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 03, 2017: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.