U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mc-00005
  • Case Name: JSC MCC EuroChem v. Chauhan
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 15, 2018: [Memorandum Opinion of the Court]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • August 09, 2018: [Leave]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
  • July 17, 2018: [Review]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Order to Ascertain Status]
  • May 09, 2018: [Ascertain Status]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 11, 2018: [Strike]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • December 15, 2017: [Leave]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 28, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order]
  • November 17, 2017: [Review]
  • November 17, 2017: [Stay]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 16, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • May 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 19, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 19, 2017: [Hearing]
  • May 18, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 18, 2017: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.