U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-mj-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Galicia et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Public Docket Annotation]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 31, 2017: [Consulate Order]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 31, 2017: [Arrest ]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 30, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • May 25, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.