U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mc-00016
  • Case Name: First National Bank of Oneida, N.A. v. Brandt
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 04, 2022: [Quash]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 21, 2022: [Quash]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Writ Returned]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice of Application for Writ]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 15, 2017: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.