U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mc-00027
  • Case Name: Cleveland Concrete Construction, Inc. v. Edwards, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 21, 2019: [Dismiss]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • December 18, 2018: [Notice of Settlement]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 01, 2018: [Sanctions]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Appoint Custodian]
  • August 27, 2018: [Compel]
  • August 27, 2018: [Appoint Receiver]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 25, 2018: [Disbursement of Funds]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • March 02, 2018: [Affidavit in Support]
  • March 01, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 21, 2018: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • February 20, 2018: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 19, 2017: [Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements]
  • June 19, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 19, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 19, 2017: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.