U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mc-00017
  • Case Name: Myers v. Minter
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • July 17, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 10, 2017: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Deficiency (IFP)]
  • June 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Support (non-motion)]
  • June 26, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.