U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mc-00009
  • Case Name: Gottlieb & Gottlieb, P.A. et al v. Crants
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 11, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 27, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 24, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 24, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 20, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 13, 2017: [Quash]
  • July 12, 2017: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.