U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mc-00021
  • Case Name: Lynx System Developers, Inc. et al v. Zebra Enterprise Solutions Corp et al (TV3)
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2017: [Proposed Sealed Document]
  • August 09, 2017: [Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • August 09, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • August 09, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 20, 2017: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • July 19, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • July 19, 2017: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.