U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mj-03081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cannamela
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order]
  • August 14, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 14, 2017: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.