U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-mj-00154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Companon et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 31, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 31, 2017: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 31, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 31, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • August 31, 2017: [Arrest ]
  • August 16, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 16, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 15, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.