U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-mc-00010
  • Case Name: Boland , et.al. v. Shoun-Allen Masonry, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 04, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac)]
  • October 02, 2017: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 22, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • September 22, 2017: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • September 12, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • September 12, 2017: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Writ of Garnishment/Execution Issued]
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac)]
  • August 30, 2017: [Application for Writ of Garnishment/Execution]
  • August 28, 2017: [Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.