U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mc-00035
  • Case Name: Bey v. Taylor et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • October 10, 2017: [Affidavit]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • September 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2017: [Response (non-motion)]
  • September 01, 2017: [Notice of Deficiency (IFP)]
  • September 01, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.