U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mj-01210-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bonilla-Cruz et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2017: [Detention]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 14, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2017: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.