U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mj-04161-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cole
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 09, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order of Detention ]
  • March 12, 2020: [Detention]
July, 2019
  • July 13, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 18, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 12, 2017: [Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 25, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 20, 2017: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.