U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mc-00013
  • Case Name: Orgill, Inc. et al v. Distribution Centers of America (WV), LLC et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 27, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 22, 2017: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.