U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-mj-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Search Warrant
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2020: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • June 16, 2020: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • June 16, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • June 16, 2020: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • April 27, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2020: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • April 27, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • April 27, 2020: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • April 23, 2019: [Search Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2019: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • April 23, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Search/Seizure Warrant]
  • April 23, 2019: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Search/Seizure Warrant Paperwork Processed]
  • January 29, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 29, 2018: [Application for Search/Seizure Warrant]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.