U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mc-00038
  • Case Name: Church v. Director Tennessee Dept of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Letter]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Objection]
  • March 14, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2018: [Reconsideration]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • February 21, 2018: [Letter]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Letter]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Deficiency (IFP)]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.