U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mj-00150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf)]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 13, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • October 11, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 10, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 10, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 10, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.