U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mc-00014
  • Case Name: Koeffler et al v. B&T Mail Service, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order]
  • November 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 15, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 14, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 25, 2017: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.