U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-mj-00252-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shelton
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • August 17, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order]
  • July 13, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 13, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed ]
  • July 11, 2018: [Sealed Petition and Order]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • June 15, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • March 28, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • February 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 19, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • December 18, 2017: [Proposed Sealed Document]
  • December 18, 2017: [Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • December 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 05, 2017: [Bond ]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2017: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 05, 2017: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • December 05, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Complaint]
  • December 05, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 05, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 05, 2017: [Arrest ]
  • December 05, 2017: [Complaint (Sealed)]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • December 05, 2017: [Seal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.