U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mc-00034
  • Case Name: Foust v. State of Tennessee
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Add and Terminate Judges]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 11, 2017: [Declaratory Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.