U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mc-00016
  • Case Name: Clark v. Akard
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Order]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 18, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.