U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee

tennessee Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-mj-02018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bryant et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order of Detention ]
  • January 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 18, 2018: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.